FL H0057 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendment to State Constitution to increase percentage of elector votes required to approve amendment or revision to State Constitution from 60 percent to 66 & 2/3 percent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Percentage of Elector Votes Required to Approve Constitutional Amendment or Revision

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Judiciary Committee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-08HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-04-08HouseFavorable by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 6
2019-04-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/08/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-04-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall -- Not considered
2019-03-26HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-25HouseFavorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 5
2019-03-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/25/19, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee
2018-11-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S232 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback