FL H0057 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for enhancement of penalties for certain offenses if commission of offense evidences prejudice based on victim's employment as justice or judge, correctional officer or correctional probation officer, or first responder.
Title
Crimes Evidencing Prejudice
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Porter [R] | Rep. Neil Combee [R] | Rep. Dane Eagle [R] | Rep. Jason Fischer [R] |
Rep. Bill Hager [R] | Rep. Don Hahnfeldt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2016-11-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0070 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1498 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1498 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/57 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0057/BillText/Filed/PDF |