FL H0055 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 401 (Ch. 2021-201)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 401 (Ch. 2021-201)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that regulations relating to building design elements may not be applied to certain dwellings; provides exceptions.
Title
Building Design
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | Rep. Toby Overdorf [R] | Rep. Joe Harding [R] |
Rep. Stan McClain [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#301 (Y: 89 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 401 (Ch. 2021-201) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-26 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 89, NAYS 24 |
2021-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Amendment 481525 adopted as amended |
2021-04-23 | House | Amendment 914293 adopted |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-21 | House | Amendment 914293 filed |
2021-04-21 | House | Amendment 583195 withdrawn |
2021-04-21 | House | Amendment 583195 filed |
2021-04-21 | House | Amendment 481525 filed |
2021-04-20 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/23/2021) |
2021-03-31 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/31/2021) |
2021-03-12 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-03-10 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-10 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-03-03 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-01 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2021-02-17 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | CS Filed |
2021-02-11 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee; Local Administration and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2020-12-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S284 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 401 (Ch. 2021-201)
S1146 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 401 (Ch. 2021-201)
H401 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-201
S1146 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 401 (Ch. 2021-201)
H401 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-201