FL H0053 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Southeast Florida Coral Reef Ecosystem Conservation Area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coral Reefs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#536 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21 Chapter No. 2018-30
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-02-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-02-07SenatePassed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
2018-02-07SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-01SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-01SenateSubstituted for SB 232
2018-02-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-01SenateWithdrawn from Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2018-01-31SenateReceived
2018-01-31SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2018-01-31SenateIn Messages
2018-01-25HousePassed; YEAS 107 NAYS 0
2018-01-25HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-11HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 01/11/18, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-15HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-15HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2017-11-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/15/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-10-12HouseNow in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-10-12HouseFavorable by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-10-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 10/12/17, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
2017-08-30HouseReferred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-08-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S232 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 53

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback