FL H0053 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates St. Johns River license plate; establishes annual use fee for plate; provides for distribution of use fees received from sale of such plates.
Title
License Plates [CPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Janet Adkins [R] | Rep. Kevin Ambler [R] | Rep. Carlos Lopez-Cantera [R] | Rep. Charles McBurney [R] |
Rep. Lake Ray [R] | Rep. Ronald Renuart [R] | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] | Rep. Michael Weinstein [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0015 - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - House - House Roll Call No. 0604 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - House - House Roll Call No. 0604 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-81 | |
2010-04-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700 | |
2010-04-23 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 01032 | |
2010-04-22 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00726; Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 -SJ 00726 | |
2010-04-21 | Withdrawn from Transportation; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00679; Substituted for SB 304 -SJ 00679; Read 2nd time -SJ 00679 | |
2010-04-20 | Received -SJ 00656 | |
2010-04-19 | Referred to Transportation; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00656 | |
2010-03-24 | In Messages | |
2010-03-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00362; Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 00362 | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00329 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00013; On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 11/04/09, 8:00 am, 404-H; Favorable by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00164; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00164; On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 02/03/10, 10:00 am, 404-H; Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00167; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00167 | |
2010-02-03 | Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0; Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-27 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 02/03/10, 10:00 am, 404-H | |
2009-11-04 | Favorable by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-10-28 | On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 11/04/09, 8:00 am, 404-H | |
2009-10-01 | Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-08-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0304 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00679; Substituted HB 53 -SJ 00679; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 53 (Ch. 2010-81) -SJ 00679
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |