FL H0051 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-07 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits employers from excluding applicant from initial interview for employment under certain conditions; provides applicability; provides exceptions; requires DEO to enforce act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Background Screening

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-07HouseWithdrawn prior to introduction
2017-11-07HouseWithdrawn from Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-08-30HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-08-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S798 (Same As) 2017-11-17 - Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Criminal Justice; Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43513Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback