FL H0051 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendment to s. 4, Art. VI of State Constitution to disqualify person who is convicted of felony from voting only until completion of all sentences imposed & expiration or completion of all conditions of supervision, if any.
Title
Voting Rights of Felons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 10 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 10 | |
2010-12-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0538 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0706 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0706 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/51 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0051/BillText/Filed/HTML |