FL H0045 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Justice Administrative Commission & Office of Attorney General to implement student loan assistance program to assist attorneys in specified positions in repayment of eligible student loans; establishes requirements; requires payments based on length of employment of eligible attorney & availability of funds; provides funding; requires employers to develop procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Loans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2014-12-19HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2014-11-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0150 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4345Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback