FL H0043 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Florida Court Educational Council to establish certain standards for instruction of circuit and county court judges for dependency cases; requiring the Department of Law Enforcement to provide certain information to law enforcement officers relating to specified individuals; requiring Child Protection Teams to be capable of providing certain training relating to head trauma and brain injuries in children younger than a specified age; requiring the Criminal Justice Standards and Training Commission to establish standards for the instruction of law enforcement officers in a specified subject, etc.
Title
Child Welfare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#738 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#468 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#468 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Chapter No. 2020-40 | |
2020-06-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-03 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-12 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2020-03-12 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-12 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (755426) |
2020-03-06 | House | In returning messages |
2020-03-06 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (755426) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 122 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2020-02-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20 |
2020-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-07 | House | CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-07 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-06 | House | CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/06/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-29 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 29 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 01/29/20, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-24 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-10-24 | House | Favorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 10/24/19, 9:30 am, 12 HOB |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-08-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S122 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 43
H1105 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-138
S1324 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1105
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7085 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
H1105 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-138
S1324 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1105
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7085 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 0142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 820 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 8296 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 988 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 17298 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |