FL H0043 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises definition of term "contribution"; revises schedule governing campaign finance reporting for candidates, political committees, & electioneering communications organizations; revises reporting requirements regarding transfers made by political committees & electioneering communications organizations; prohibits political committee or an electioneering communications organization from transferring funds to certain entities; provides transitional provision regarding final monthly reports by candidates, political committees, & electioneering communications organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign Financing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-08-30HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2017-08-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S122 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
106011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1060703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10638Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback