FL H0041 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DOH to contract with not-for-profit statewide alliance of organizations to provide pregnancy support & wellness services through subcontractors; provides duties of department; provides contract requirements; requires services to be provided in noncoercive manner & forbides inclusion of religious content.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pregnancy Support and Wellness Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#514 (Y: 73 N: 29 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21 Chapter No. 2018-29
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-02-21HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-02-08SenateCS passed; YEAS 21 NAYS 12
2018-02-08SenateAmendment(s) failed (312228, 894162)
2018-02-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-07SenateAmendment(s) failed (312228)
2018-02-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-07SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 444
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-07SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2018-01-31SenateReceived
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2018-01-24SenateIn Messages
2018-01-12HouseCS passed; YEAS 73 NAYS 29
2018-01-12HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-11HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-11HouseAmendment(s) failed (700107)
2018-01-11HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-09HouseCS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/11/18
2017-11-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-11-15HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-11-14HouseCS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 5
2017-11-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 11/14/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-08-30HouseReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2017-08-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S444 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 41

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38196Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/Amendment/623167/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/Amendment/700107/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/Amendment/312228/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/Amendment/876484/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/Amendment/749088/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/Amendment/882868/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/Amendment/401240/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/Amendment/780182/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/Amendment/163744/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/Amendment/147560/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/Amendment/894162/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/Vote/HouseVote_h00041c1514.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/41/Vote/SenateVote_h00041c1002.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback