FL H0037 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises civil penalties for certain violations relating to stopping for school bus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Bus Safety

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#460 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22 Chapter No. 2020-64
2020-06-20 Approved by Governor
2020-06-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-06HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-06SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 290
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-05SenateWithdrawn from Infrastructure and Security; Judiciary; Rules
2020-03-02SenateReceived
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Judiciary; Rules
2020-02-26SenateIn Messages
2020-02-20HouseCS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2020-02-20HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-19HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-02-19HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20
2020-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-31HouseCS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2020-01-30HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-30HouseCS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2020-01-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/30/20, 11:30 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-15HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-01-15HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, Reed Hall
2019-12-11HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-12-11HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-12-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall
2019-09-23HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-08-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S290 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 37

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback