FL H0033 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 50-20-2)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires law enforcement officer to inform motor vehicle operator of certain rights; prohibits certain actions by officer; requires officer to record race & ethnicity of violator when issuing citation; requires law enforcement agencies to report such information to DHSMV; requires DHSMV to annually report certain data to Governor & Legislature; removes requirement that enforcement be accomplished as secondary action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Texting While Driving

Sponsors

House of Delegates Government Accountability Committee CommitteeHouse of Delegates Judiciary Committee CommitteeRep. Jackie Toledo [R]Rep. Irving Slosberg [D]
Rep. Joseph Abruzzo [D]Rep. Larry Ahern [R]Rep. Thad Altman [R]Rep. Robert Asencio [D]
Rep. Bryan Avila [R]Rep. Lori Berman [D]Rep. Halsey Beshears [R]Rep. Jim Boyd [R]
Rep. Daniel Burgess [R]Rep. Colleen Burton [R]Rep. Matthew Caldwell [R]Rep. Chuck Clemons [R]
Rep. Robert Cortes [R]Rep. John Cortes [D]Rep. Janet Cruz [D]Rep. Kimberly Daniels [D]
Rep. Tracie Davis [D]Rep. Manny Diaz [R]Rep. Byron Donalds [R]Rep. Brad Drake [R]
Rep. Nicholas Duran [D]Rep. Katie Edwards [D]Rep. Julian Fant [R]Rep. Heather Fitzenhagen [R]
Rep. Michael Grant [R]Rep. Joe Gruters [R]Rep. Bill Hager [R]Rep. Gayle Harrell [R]
Rep. Shawn Harrison [R]Rep. Blaise Ingoglia [R]Rep. Kristin Jacobs [D]Rep. Sam Killebrew [R]
Rep. Mike LaRosa [R]Rep. Chris Latvala [R]Rep. Tom Leek [R]Rep. MaryLynn Magar [R]
Rep. Amber Mariano [R]Rep. Ralph Massullo [R]Rep. Stan McClain [R]Rep. Lawrence Mcclure [R]
Rep. Amy Mercado [D]Rep. Larry Metz [R]Rep. Mike Miller [R]Rep. George Moraitis [R]
Rep. Jared Moskowitz [D]Rep. Jeanette Nunez [R]Rep. Robert Olszewski [R]Rep. Bobby Payne [R]
Rep. Daniel Perez [R]Rep. Scott Plakon [R]Rep. Rene Plasencia [R]Rep. Mel Ponder [R]
Rep. Holly Raschein [R]Rep. David Richardson [D]Rep. Bob Rommel [R]Rep. Rick Roth [R]
Rep. Barrington Russell [D]Rep. David Santiago [R]Rep. Carlos Smith [D]Rep. Ross Spano [R]
Rep. Richard Stark [D]Rep. Cyndi Stevenson [R]Rep. Charlie Stone [R]Rep. Clovis Watson [D]
Rep. Frank White [R]Rep. Matt Willhite [D]Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D]Rep. Jayer Williamson [R]

Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#680 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-05SenateReceived
2018-03-05SenateReferred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 2
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-05HouseCS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
2018-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-02HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-01HouseCS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/01/18, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-29HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-26HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2018-01-26HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-25HouseCS by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1
2018-01-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/25/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-09HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-01-09HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/09/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2017-12-13HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-12-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H121 (Similar To) 2017-12-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S72 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S90 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316305Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback