FL H0033 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates "Florida Competitive Workforce Act"; prohibits discrimination based on sexual orientation & gender identity or expression; defines terms; provides exceptions for constitutionally protected free exercise of religion.
Title
Prohibited Discrimination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2014-12-19 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2014-11-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0156 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
419 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/33 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0033/BillText/Filed/PDF |