FL H0029 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-8-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Chapter No. 2018-7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Don Hahnfeldt Veteran and Military Family Opportunity Act"; revising licensure eligibility requirements; requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to waive certain fees; authorizing the licensing authority to recognize certain military-issued credentials for purposes of licensure; designating March 25 of each year as "Medal of Honor Day"; requiring the State Board of Education to issue a temporary certificate in educational leadership to certain persons, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military and Veterans Affairs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#609 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14 Chapter No. 2018-7
2018-03-13 Approved by Governor
2018-03-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-05HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-05SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2018-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1884
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-02SenateWithdrawn from Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-26SenateReceived
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-20SenateIn Messages
2018-02-14HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseAmendment(s) adopted (795913) 577
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-06HouseFavorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0
2018-02-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/06/18, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-01-29HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-29HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-25HouseCS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2018-01-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/29/18, 3:00 pm, 12 HOB
2018-01-25HouseNow in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2018-01-24HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-24HouseCS by Commerce Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 01/24/18, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Commerce Committee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H699 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
H949 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
H1047 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H1073 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-102
H1191 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
S1090 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
S1198 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
S1292 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1073
S1486 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
S1566 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
S1884 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 29
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100237Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100342Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101259Amended CodeSee Bill Text
250483Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
472015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
472016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49400312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49400313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497140Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497281Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497368Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497369Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497370Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497371Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497373Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497374Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497375Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497393Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497453Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497466Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497554Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
52702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
539001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559928Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626732Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6267355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6267851Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6268311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6268417Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6268732Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6268734Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626927Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269272Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633332Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633444Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64834Amended CodeSee Bill Text
648355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
683147Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/29
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/29/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/29/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/29/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/29/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/29/Amendment/952103/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/29/Amendment/397211/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/29/Amendment/914065/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/29/Amendment/065291/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/29/Amendment/795913/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/29/Vote/HouseVote_h00029c1609.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/29/Vote/SenateVote_h00029e1014.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/29/Vote/SenateVote_h00029e1015.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback