FL H0027 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands categories of persons who may prescribe brand drugs under prescription drug program when medically necessary; exempts controlled substances prescribed by ARNP or physician assistant from disqualifications for certification or licensure as deputy or state pilot; applies certain existing penalties to ARNPs; requires ARNPs & physician assistants who prescribe controlled substances to make certain designation, comply with registration requirements, & follow specified standards of practice; redefines term "practitioner" to include ARNPs & physician assistants under Florida Comprehensive Drug Abuse Prevention & Control Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug Prescription by Advanced Registered Nurse Practitioners & Physician Assistants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#422 (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19SenateDied in Health Policy
2015-06-12SenateReceived
2015-06-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations
2015-06-12SenateIn Messages
2015-06-12HousePassed; YEAS 97 NAYS 2
2015-06-12HouseRead 3rd time
2015-06-11HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-06-11HouseRead 2nd time
2015-06-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/11/15
2015-06-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-06-10HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 2
2015-06-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 06/10/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2015-06-01HouseReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2015-06-01HouseIntroduced
2015-05-27HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
310071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
310073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
310081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45644Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458347Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583475Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458348Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4650158Amended CodeSee Bill Text
46602751Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94417Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948101Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback