FL H0019 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Responsible Roadways Act; revises security requirements & proof of such security for owners & operators of motor vehicles; repeals Florida Motor Vehicle No-Fault Law.
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#511 (Y: 88 N: 15 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Received |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2018-01-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-01-12 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 88 NAYS 15 |
2018-01-12 | House | Read 3rd time 334 |
2018-01-11 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-01-11 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (006077, 253915, 298833) 301 |
2018-01-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-09 | House | CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/11/18 |
2017-11-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-11-15 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-11-07 | House | CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 7 |
2017-10-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 11/07/17, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-10-18 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2017-10-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S150 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 646 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 771 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 0221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 989 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 06501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0652 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0653 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 4132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 727 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 728 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 730 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 731 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 732 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 733 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 734 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 736 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 737 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 739 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 748 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 8405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
705 | 184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |