FL H0019 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Land Acquisition Trust Fund within DACS; identifies purpose of trust fund & sources of funds; provides for transfer of moneys to trust fund within DEP under certain circumstances; provides for future review of trust fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trust Funds/Creation/Land Acquisition Trust Fund/DACS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
2015-06-04HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2015-06-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15
2015-06-01HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-06-01HouseIntroduced
2015-05-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0015 (Related) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222)
H0001 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-08-18 - Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
570201Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback