FL H0019 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits school superintendent, with approval of the school board, to authorize school safety designee to carry concealed weapon or firearm on school property; provides requirements for school safety designees; provides exception to prohibition on possession of firearms or other specified devices on school property or other specified areas; provides for fingerprint processing & retention; requires that fees be borne by school safety designee or school; requires school boards to formulate policies & procedures for dealing with active shooters & hostage situations in consultation with law enforcement; requires district school boards & private schools allow campus tours by local law enforcement agencies for specified purposes & that their recommendations be documented; permits district school boards to commission one or more school safety officers on each school campus.
Title
School Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-02 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 3 |
2015-03-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/02/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-24 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2015-03-23 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-19 | House | CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 9 |
2015-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/19/15, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-03-11 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Favorable by K-12 Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- K-12 Subcommittee, 03/11/15, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2014-12-19 | House | Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2014-11-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0180 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1006 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |