FL H0017 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-136
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-136
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Board of Podiatric Medicine to require specified number of continuing education hours related to safe & effective prescribing of controlled substances; provides for governance of podiatric physicians who are supervising medical assistants.
Title
Podiatric Medicine
Sponsors
Rep. Melony Bell [R] | Rep. Sam Killebrew [R] | Rep. Robin Bartleman [D] | Rep. Tommy Gregory [R] |
Rep. Ralph Massullo [R] | Rep. Daisy Morales [D] | Rep. Jenna Persons-Mulicka [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#47 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#47 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Chapter No. 2021-136 | |
2021-06-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-08 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-08 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 170 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-07 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-07 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-03-31 | House | Amendment 536577 adopted |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-26 | House | Amendment 536577 filed |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/31/2021) |
2021-03-09 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2021-03-03 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-01 | House | Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Professions and Public Health Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-11-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S170 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 17 (Ch. 2021-136)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
461 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
461 | 0155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |