FL H0017 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Petitions Congress to call convention pursuant to Art. V of U.S. Constitution to consider amending U.S. Constitution to limit terms of members of Congress to 12 years; provides that purview of such convention be limited strictly to consideration of such amendment; provides that such application to Congress be continuing application until convention applied for is convened.
Title
Congressional Term Limits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Rules and Calendar Council; Policy Council -HJ 00010 | |
2009-10-01 | Referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Rules and Calendar Council; Policy Council | |
2009-06-30 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2222 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections