FL H0015 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Terminates obsolete trust funds & provides for disposition of balances; revises distributions of documentary stamp tax revenues into certain trust funds; revises distributions of revenues upon sale of certain lands; reenacts the Land Acquisition Trust Fund; deletes obsolete provisions relating to use of bond & trust fund proceeds; conforms provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implementation of Water and Land Conservation Constitutional Amendment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222)
2015-06-04HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2015-06-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15
2015-06-01HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-06-01HouseIntroduced
2015-05-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0017 (Related) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
H0019 (Related) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
S2516 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-229, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222)
S2502 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-222, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229)
H0001 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-08-18 - Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16105301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
161054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
161091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1761Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2010205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2113103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21520Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215618Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215619Amended CodeSee Bill Text
253027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
253034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2537824Amended CodeSee Bill Text
258015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
258435Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2591051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2870595Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338250Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3390801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3392818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3392819Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33961Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34358Amended CodeSee Bill Text
369252Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373089Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373129Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3731391Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373199Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373430Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373459Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3734592Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37345926Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373470Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373584Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37359Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3735905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375044Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
376123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
376307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37640Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379214Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3800666Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3800677Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380508Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380510Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4030615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40308601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4031651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403885Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4038911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4039325Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40393345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4205092Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209079Amended CodeSee Bill Text
570207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
570321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89509Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback