FL H0011 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to limit the terms of office for a member of a district school board.
Title
Limitation on Terms of Office for Members of a District School Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Secondary Education and Career Development Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Elections Committee; Education and Employment Committee |
2020-11-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/11 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/11/BillText/Filed/PDF |