FL H0011 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for incremental reduction of tax imposed on rental or license fees charged for use of commercial real property; provides for future repeal of tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax On Sales, Use & Other Transactions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02HouseDied in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced
2013-10-07HouseReferred to Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2013-08-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0176 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
212031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2120598Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2120602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881258Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341840Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback