FL H0011 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits dependent child who is U.S. citizen from being denied classification as resident for tuition purposes based solely upon citizenship status of parent; requires adoption of rules & regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resident Status for Tuition Purposes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03HouseDied in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-01-11HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2012-12-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0268 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
H0017 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee
H0029 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee
H7051 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
S0180 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100921Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback