FL H0011 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7039 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Designates SP4 Thomas Berry Corbin Memorial Highway & U.S. Navy BMC Samuel Calhoun Chavous, Jr. Memorial Highway in Dixie County; Marine Lance Corporal Brian R. Buesing Memorial Highway, U.S. Army Sergeant Karl A. Campbell Memorial Highway, & U.S. Army SPC James A. Page Memorial Highway in Levy County; & Captain Jim Reynolds, Jr., USAF "Malibu" Road in Lake County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Facility Designations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Economic Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7039 (Ch.
2012-01-10 CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 161
2012-01-10 Introduced -HJ 9
2011-12-16 Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 169
2011-12-13 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-12-06 CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 178
2011-11-29 On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 12/06/11, 3:35 pm, 306 HOB
2011-09-15 Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 9
2011-05-27 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback