FL H0011 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides child-restraint requirements for certain children ages 4 through 7; provides certain exceptions; redefines term "motor vehicle" to exclude certain vehicles from such requirements; provides grace period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child-restraint Requirements

Sponsors

Rep. Joseph Abruzzo [D]Sen. Ben Albritton [R]Sen. Frank Artiles [R]Sen. Dennis Baxley [R]
Rep. Leonard Bembry [D]Sen. Lori Berman [D]Rep. Mackenson Bernard [D]Rep. Esteban Bovo [R]
Rep. Debbie Boyd [D]Sen. Dwight Bullard [D]Sen. Daphne Campbell [D]Rep. Charles Chestnut [D]
Rep. Gwyndolen Clarke-Reed [D]Sen. Jeff Clemens [D]Rep. Fredrick Costello [R]Sen. Janet Cruz [D]
Rep. Jose Diaz [R]Rep. Clay Ford [R]Rep. James Frishe [R]Rep. Reggie Fullwood [D]
Rep. Luis Garcia [D]Rep. Joseph Gibbons [D]Rep. Richard Glorioso [R]Rep. Tom Goodson [R]
Rep. James Grant [R]Rep. Bill Hager [R]Sen. Ed Hooper [R]Rep. Mike Horner [R]
Rep. Evan Jenne [D]Rep. Mia Jones [D]Rep. John Julien [D]Rep. Martin Kiar [D]
Rep. Rick Kriseman [D]Rep. Ana Logan [R]Rep. Charles McBurney [R]Rep. Larry Metz [R]
Rep. Peter Nehr [R]Rep. Jeanette Nunez [R]Rep. Mark Pafford [D]Sen. Kathleen Passidomo [R]
Rep. Steven Perman [D]Sen. Keith Perry [R]Rep. Raymond Pilon [R]Rep. Scott Plakon [R]
Rep. Elizabeth Porter [R]Rep. Ari Porth [D]Rep. Scott Randolph [D]Rep. Lake Ray [R]
Rep. Betty Reed [D]Rep. Michelle Rehwinkel Vasilinda [D]Rep. Ronald Renuart [R]Rep. Kenneth Roberson [R]
Rep. Hazelle Rogers [D]Rep. Patrick Rooney [R]Sen. Darryl Rouson [D]Rep. Franklin Sands [D]
Rep. Ron Saunders [D]Rep. Elaine Schwartz [D]Rep. Irving Slosberg [D]Rep. Jimmie Smith [R]
Sen. Darren Soto [D]Rep. Cynthia Stafford [D]Rep. Richard Steinberg [D]Sen. Greg Steube [R]
Rep. Dwayne Taylor [D]Rep. Geraldine Thompson [D]Sen. Perry Thurston [D]Rep. John Tobia [R]
Rep. Carlos Trujillo [R]Rep. Charles Van Zant [R]Rep. James Waldman [D]Rep. Barbara Watson [D]
Rep. Michael Weinstein [R]Rep. Alan Williams [D]Rep. Trudi Williams [R]Sen. Dana Young [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 8
2011-01-10 Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 8
2010-11-16 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0238 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316613Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback