FL H0011 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reclassifies offenses evidencing prejudice based on homeless status of victim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes Against Homeless Persons [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0010 - Passage (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-46
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-27 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01177
2010-04-27 Read 3rd time -SJ 00887; Passed; YEAS 25 NAYS 10 -SJ 00887
2010-04-26 Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00852; Substituted for SB 506 -SJ 00852; Read 2nd time -SJ 00852
2010-04-22 Received -SJ 00753; Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00753
2010-04-20 In Messages
2010-04-20 Read 3rd time -HJ 00773; Passed; YEAS 80 NAYS 28 -HJ 00773
2010-04-19 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00749
2010-03-16 Favorable by- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 -HJ 00302; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00302
2010-03-12 On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 03/16/10, 10:15 am, 404-H
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00010; On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 01/12/10, 10:00 am, 404-H; Favorable by Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00164; Now in Policy Council -HJ 00165; On Council agenda-- Policy Council, 01/21/10, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall; Favorable by Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 -HJ 00166; Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00166
2010-01-21 Favorable by Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 1; Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
2010-01-14 On Council agenda-- Policy Council, 01/21/10, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2010-01-13 Now in Policy Council
2010-01-12 Favorable by Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2010-01-05 On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 01/12/10, 10:00 am, 404-H
2009-10-01 Referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
2009-06-15 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0506 (Similar To) 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00852; Substituted HB 11 -SJ 00852; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 11 (Ch. 2010-46) -SJ 00852

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0775085Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback