FL H0009 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Designates act "Rule of Law Adherence Act"; prohibits sanctuary policies; requires state & local governmental agencies to comply with & support enforcement of federal immigration law; provides requirements concerning immigration detainers & certain arrested persons; prohibits restrictions on transfer of certain information related to enforcement of immigration law; authorizes law enforcement agency to transport unauthorized alien; authorizes ordinances for recovery immigration detainer costs; provides whistle-blower protections for certain officials; requires AG to prescribe format for complaints; provides injunctive relief & civil penalties; prohibits expenditure of public funds for specified purposes; provides cause of action for personal injury or wrongful death attributed to sanctuary policy; prohibits discrimination on specified grounds; requires repeal of existing sanctuary policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Immigration Enforcement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#501 (Y: 71 N: 35 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#499 (Y: 38 N: 67 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#498 (Y: 39 N: 67 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#497 (Y: 38 N: 68 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-31SenateReceived
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Judiciary; Rules
2018-01-24SenateIn Messages
2018-01-12HouseCS passed; YEAS 71 NAYS 35
2018-01-12HouseRead 3rd time 329
2018-01-11HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-11HouseAmendment(s) failed (396255, 420719, 932581)
2018-01-11HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-09HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/11/18
2017-11-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-11-07HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-11-07HouseCS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 7
2017-10-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 11/07/17, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall
2017-08-30HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-08-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S308 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
908101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908402Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/9
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/9/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/9/BillText/c1/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/9/Amendment/689883/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/9/Amendment/932581/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/9/Amendment/396255/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/9/Amendment/659881/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/9/Amendment/121347/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/9/Amendment/420719/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/9/Vote/HouseVote_h00009c1497.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/9/Vote/HouseVote_h00009c1498.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/9/Vote/HouseVote_h00009c1499.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/9/Vote/HouseVote_h00009c1501.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback