FL H0009 | 2015 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends designation of certain hospitals as rural hospitals; removes community intermediate care facilities for the developmentally disabled from statutory rate freeze; updates references to data used for calculating disproportionate share program payments to certain hospitals; provides that certain rebates be placed in General Revenue Fund, unallocated; provides for deposit of contributions into Grants & Donations Trust Fund; repeals provisions relating to state & local Medicaid partnerships; removes requirement that AHCA support Healthy Start services with public expenditures & federal matching funds; specifies factors agency must consider to reconcile payments to long-term care managed care plans.
Title
Medicaid
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Hudson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225) |
2015-06-04 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2015-06-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15 |
2015-06-01 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-06-01 | House | Introduced |
2015-05-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2508 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-225, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
H0001 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-08-18 - Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules
H0001 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-08-18 - Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
395 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 97 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 983 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/9A |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015A/0009A/BillText/Filed/PDF |