FL H0007 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 300 (Ch. 2023-21)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 300 (Ch. 2023-21)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits use of state funds for person to travel to another state to receive services to support abortion; requires DOH to report to Governor & Legislature information relating to Florida Pregnancy Care Network, Inc.; prohibits physician from knowingly performing or inducing termination of pregnancy after specified period of time; provides exceptions; requires physician to perform or induce termination of pregnancy or to dispense abortion-inducing drugs in person; removes provisions relating to termination of pregnancies during viability; prohibits telehealth provider from using telehealth to provide abortion; provides appropriations.
Title
Pregnancy and Parenting Support
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 300 (Ch. 2023-21) |
2023-04-13 | House | Substituted SB 300 |
2023-04-10 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2023) |
2023-03-31 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-31 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-03-30 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-30 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-30 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2023-03-16 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-14 | House | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-09 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S300 (Similar To) 2023-04-14 - Chapter No. 2023-21
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
286 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 96 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 01112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |