FL H0005 | 2023 | 3rd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on November 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-14 - Chapter No. 2023-351
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions related to scrutinized companies including definitions, criteria for being identified as scrutinized company, name of scrutinized company list, assembly & updating of such list, removal from such list, & government contracting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Scrutinized Companies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-11-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#520 (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-06 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-14 Chapter No. 2023-351
2023-11-13 Approved by Governor
2023-11-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2023-11-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2023-11-08HouseIn Messages
2023-11-08SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2023-11-08SenateRead 3rd time
2023-11-08SenateRead 2nd time
2023-11-08SenateSubstituted for SB 10-C
2023-11-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2023-11-08SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2023-11-07SenateReceived
2023-11-07SenateReferred to Rules
2023-11-07SenateIn Messages
2023-11-07HousePassed; YEAS 100, NAYS 2
2023-11-07HouseRead 3rd time
2023-11-07HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2023-11-07HouseRead 2nd time
2023-11-06House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-11-06HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (11/7/2023)
2023-11-06HouseBill released to House Calendar
2023-11-06HouseReported out of State Affairs Committee
2023-11-06HouseFavorable by State Affairs Committee
2023-11-02HouseAdded to State Affairs Committee agenda
2023-11-02HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2023-11-02HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2023-11-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S10 (Same As) 2023-11-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5-C (Ch. 2023-351)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21547Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215473Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624449Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback