FL H0005 | 2022 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 6-C (Ch. 2022-267)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 6-C (Ch. 2022-267)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of term "social media platform."
Title
Social Media Platforms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 6-C (Ch. 2022-267) |
2022-04-20 | House | Substituted SB 6-C |
2022-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-04-19 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-04-19 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2022) |
2022-04-19 | House | Bill released to Rules Committee |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-04-19 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2022-04-19 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-04-19 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-04-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-04-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S6 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Chapter No. 2022-267
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
106 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 2041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |