FL H0005 | 2017 | Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 8-A (Ch. 2017-232), SB 6-A (Ch. 2017-231)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from the state tax on sales, use, and other transactions for marijuana & marijuana delivery devices used for medical purposes; provides qualifying medical conditions for patient to be eligible to receive marijuana or marijuana delivery device; provides for establishment of medical marijuana testing laboratories; establishes Coalition for Medical Marijuana Research and Education within H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center and Research Institute, Inc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Use of Marijuana

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#486 (Y: 37 N: 71 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 8-A (Ch. 2017-232), SB 6-A (Ch. 2017-231)
2017-06-08HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-06-08HouseAmendment(s) failed (769791) 17
2017-06-08HouseRead 2nd time 14
2017-06-07HouseIntroduced 4
2017-06-07HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/08/17
2017-06-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-06-07HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 1
2017-06-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 06/07/17, 5:15 pm, Morris Hall
2017-06-07HouseReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2017-06-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7 (Related) 2017-06-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 6-A (Ch. 2017-231), SB 8-A (Ch. 2017-232)
S8 (Similar To) 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-232, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 6-A (Ch. 2017-231)
S6 (Similar To) 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-231, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 8-A (Ch. 2017-232)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10044351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004441Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1006062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381986Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381988Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381989Amended CodeSee Bill Text
385211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
385212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4990295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89302Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback