FL H0001 | 2022 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2-C (Ch. 2022-265)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2-C (Ch. 2022-265)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redistricts state's congressional districts in accordance with U.S. Decennial Census of 2020 (plan P000C0109); amends provisions relating to inclusion of unlisted territory in contiguous districts; reenacts provisions which provide for election of representatives to U.S. House of Representatives; provides requirements relating to actions challenging the state's congressional districts; reenacts provisions relating to severability; provides for applicability; provides severability; provides appropriation.
Title
Establishing the Congressional Districts of the State
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Leek [R] | Rep. Alex Andrade [R] | Rep. Cord Byrd [R] | Rep. Jim Mooney [R] |
Rep. Scott Plakon [R] | Sen. Clay Yarborough [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - House - House Congressional Redistricting Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2-C (Ch. 2022-265) |
2022-04-20 | House | Substituted SB 2-C |
2022-04-20 | House | Amendment 799545 Failed |
2022-04-20 | House | Amendment 717833 Failed |
2022-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-04-19 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-04-19 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2022) |
2022-04-19 | House | Bill released to Rules Committee |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported out of Congressional Redistricting Subcommittee |
2022-04-19 | House | Favorable by Congressional Redistricting Subcommittee |
2022-04-19 | House | Added to Congressional Redistricting Subcommittee agenda |
2022-04-19 | House | Now in Congressional Redistricting Subcommittee |
2022-04-19 | House | Referred to Congressional Redistricting Subcommittee |
2022-04-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Chapter No. 2022-265
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 0001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 0002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 0611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 086 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 088 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |