FL H0001 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Hope Scholarship Program; requiring a school district to notify an eligible student's parent of the program and specified opportunities; authorizing certain persons to elect to direct certain state sales and use tax revenue to be transferred to a nonprofit scholarship-funding organizations for the Hope Scholarship Program; requiring the Department of Revenue to share specified information with eligible nonprofit scholarship-funding organizations; providing private school requirements for participation in educational scholarship programs; revising eligible expenditures for the Gardiner Scholarship Program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Hope Scholarship Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#761 (Y: 71 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Messages
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 71 NAYS 41
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseAmendment(s) adopted (109767, 357475, 439925, 541089, 703681) 797
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-12HouseCS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
2018-02-09HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-07HouseCS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 4
2018-02-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/07/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2018-02-05HouseNow in Education Committee
2018-01-31HouseCS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-31HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-30HouseCS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 4
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-08HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-11-08HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 5
2017-11-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 11/08/17, 4:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2017-11-01HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2017-11-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1172 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6
H6051 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
S1848 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
S732 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 731

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1002385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100239Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100240Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2121832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
213053Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1/Amendment/245911/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1/Amendment/558695/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1/Amendment/235511/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1/Amendment/147513/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1/Amendment/439925/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1/Amendment/109767/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1/Amendment/357475/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1/Amendment/703681/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1/Amendment/541089/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1/Amendment/390773/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1/Vote/HouseVote_h00001e1761.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback