FL H0001 | 2017 | Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-233
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Terminating the Displaced Homemaker Trust Fund within the Department of Economic Opportunity; creating the Florida Job Growth Grant Fund within the Department of Economic Opportunity; requiring the Florida Tourism Industry Marketing Corporation to comply with certain per diem and travel expense provisions; creating the Targeted Marketing Assistance Program to enhance the tourism business marketing of small, minority, rural, and agritourism businesses in the state; providing appropriations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#493 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#489 (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28 Chapter No. 2017-233
2017-06-26 Approved by Governor
2017-06-19 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-06-09HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2017-06-09SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 1
2017-06-09SenateConcurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (079197, 832137, 872905) 83
2017-06-09SenateIn returning messages
2017-06-09HousePassed as amended; YEAS 105 NAYS 4 28
2017-06-09HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (196286)
2017-06-09HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended (268268, 371940)
2017-06-09HouseAmendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (079197, 832137, 872905) 27
2017-06-09HouseIn returning messages
2017-06-09SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 2
2017-06-09SenateRead 3rd time
2017-06-09SenateAmendment(s) adopted (196286, 268268, 371940)
2017-06-09SenateRead 2nd time
2017-06-09SenateSubstituted for SB 2-A
2017-06-09SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-06-09SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2017-06-09SenateReceived
2017-06-09SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-06-09SenateIn Messages
2017-06-09HousePassed; YEAS 111 NAYS 4 22
2017-06-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-06-08HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-06-08HouseAmendment(s) failed (019449, 377733, 635253)
2017-06-08HouseRead 2nd time 8
2017-06-07HouseIntroduced 3
2017-06-07HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/08/17
2017-06-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-06-07HouseFavorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 27 NAYS 0
2017-06-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 06/07/17, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
2017-06-05HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2017-06-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2 (Similar To) 2017-06-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1-A (Ch. 2017-233)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
187201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881168Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28812266Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28892Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44650Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44652Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
741011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/Amendment/669045/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/Amendment/019449/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/Amendment/635253/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/Amendment/377733/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/Amendment/558384/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/Amendment/196286/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/Amendment/268268/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/Amendment/872905/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/Amendment/371940/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/Amendment/079197/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/Amendment/832137/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/Vote/HouseVote_h00001A__489.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/Vote/SenateVote_h00001A__006.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/Vote/HouseVote_h00001A__493.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/1A/Vote/SenateVote_h00001A__009.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback