FL H0001 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on August 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-21 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Redistricts state's congressional districts in accordance with U.S. Decennial Census of 2010 (plan H000C9065); reenacts related provisions; provides for applicability; repeals provisions for congressional districts superseded by act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Congressional Districts of the State

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#448 (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#446 (Y: 76 N: 35 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#445 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-21SenateDied in returning Messages
2015-08-21SenateIn returning messages
2015-08-21HouseRequested Senate to recede
2015-08-21HouseRefused to concur in amendment(s) to House amendment(s) (284802)
2015-08-21HouseIn returning messages
2015-08-21SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 23 NAYS 5
2015-08-21SenateConcurred in House amendment(s) as amended
2015-08-21SenateAmendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (284802)
2015-08-21SenateIn returning messages
2015-08-21HouseRefused to recede
2015-08-21HouseWas taken up
2015-08-21HouseIn returning messages
2015-08-21SenateRequested House to recede or appoint conference committee
2015-08-21SenateRefused to concur in amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (179133) 265
2015-08-20SenateIn returning messages
2015-08-20HousePassed as amended; YEAS 60 NAYS 38
2015-08-20HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended (876908)
2015-08-20HouseAmendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (179133)
2015-08-20HouseAmendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) failed (385535)
2015-08-20HouseWas taken up
2015-08-19HouseIn returning messages
2015-08-19SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 28 NAYS 8
2015-08-19SenateRead 3rd time
2015-08-19SenateAmendment(s) adopted (876908) 217
2015-08-19SenateRead 2nd time
2015-08-19SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 2-B
2015-08-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-08-19SenateWithdrawn from Reapportionment
2015-08-18SenateReceived
2015-08-18SenateReferred to Reapportionment
2015-08-18SenateIn Messages
2015-08-18HousePassed; YEAS 76 NAYS 35
2015-08-18HouseRead 3rd time
2015-08-17HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-08-17HouseAmendment(s) failed (617051)
2015-08-17HouseRead 2nd time
2015-08-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 08/17/15
2015-08-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-08-13HouseFavorable by- Select Committee on Redistricting; YEAS 9 NAYS 4
2015-08-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Select Committee on Redistricting, 08/13/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-08-10HouseReferred to Select Committee on Redistricting
2015-08-10HouseIntroduced
2015-08-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0002 (Same As) 2015-08-19 - Laid on Table

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
80001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
80002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
80111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
80112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
80611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
808Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8083Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8086Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8088Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/1B
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/BillText/Filed/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Amendment/338861/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Amendment/306475/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Amendment/085087/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Amendment/617051/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Amendment/876908/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Amendment/918370/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Amendment/418552/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Amendment/236730/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Amendment/267580/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Amendment/385535/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Amendment/179133/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Amendment/284802/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Vote/HouseVote_h0001B__445.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Vote/HouseVote_h0001B__446.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Vote/SenateVote_h0001B__002.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Vote/HouseVote_h0001B__448.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015B/0001B/Vote/SenateVote_h0001B__004.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback