Florida Recently Introduced Bills

Browse Legislation - State Dashboard - View Trending

BillSummaryLast Action
H8065Recognizes importance of awareness of meningococcal disease.2018-02-20
Filed
H7089Creates and revises numerous provisions relating to public safety.2018-02-20
H7087Provides an exemption from excise tax on certain documents notes & mortgages related to housing financing authority; provides sales tax exemptions for specified products destroyed or reduced in value as a result of hurricanes; authorizes ad valorem t...2018-02-20
H7085Directs DOH, in coordination with Division of Emergency Management & local emergency management agencies, to maintain a statewide registry of persons with special needs; requires nursing homes, assisted living facilities, home health agencies and nur...2018-02-20
H8059Designates April 1-7, 2018, as "Autism Awareness Week."2018-02-16
Introduced
H8053Congratulates UCF Knights on their exemplary undefeated 2017 football season.2018-02-16
Introduced
H8057Recognizes third Saturday in December 2018 as "Harry Tyson Moore & Harriette Vyda Simms Moore Day" in Florida.2018-02-16
Introduced
H8055Designates May 19, 2018, as "Armed Forces Day" in the State of Florida.2018-02-16
Introduced
H8063Recognizes outstanding achievements of Tammy Jerkins as an educator and congratulates her on her designation as the 2018 Florida Teacher of the Year.2018-02-16
Introduced
H8061Commends John A. Delaney on his extraordinary achievements as president of UNF.2018-02-16
Introduced
H8049Recognizes June 12, 2018, as "Pulse Remembrance Day" in Florida.2018-02-16
Introduced
H8051Designates May 2018 as "American Stroke Month."2018-02-16
Introduced
H7083Extends number of days that certain state employees may be granted administrative leave to participate in federal disaster relief services; authorizes Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Funds to be used for specified purposes; provides specified requireme...2018-02-19
S1928Recognizing February 25, 2018, as "St. Johns River State College Day" and commemorating the college's 60th anniversary, etc.2018-02-14
Filed
S1926Recognizing and celebrating the 40th anniversary of the preservation of Florida's 1902 Historic Capitol, etc.2018-02-14
Filed
H7081Transfers provisions; provides that certain information held by Department of Lottery is confidential & exempt from public record requirements; provides for retroactive application; provides for future legislative review & repeal; provides public nec...2018-02-20
Placed on 3rd reading
S1924Recognizing February 15 and 16, 2018, as "Kappas at the Kapitol Days" in Florida, etc.2018-02-12
Filed
H7079Creates exemption from public record requirements for certain information of people using public shelters during emergencies & for certain identifying information related to damage assessments held by agencies following disaster; provides for exempti...2018-02-20
H7077Removes scheduled repeal of exemption from public record requirements for complaint of misconduct against agency employee & all information obtained pursuant to investigation of such complaint.2018-02-20
H7075Extends scheduled repeal date & revises exemption from public record requirements for certain payment instrument transaction information held by the Office of Financial Regulation; provides that office may release such information without revealing s...2018-02-20
S1922Recognizing March 2018 as "Endometriosis Awareness Month" in Florida, etc.2018-02-09
Filed
H8045Recognizes February 25, 2018, as "St. Johns River State College Day" & commemorates the college's 60th anniversary.2018-02-08
Adopted by Publication
S1920Providing an exemption for electronic mail addresses of vessel registrants collected by the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessit...2018-02-08
H8047Designates March 2018 as "Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month."2018-02-07
Introduced
S1918Recognizing February 2018 as "Self-Care Month" in Florida, etc.2018-02-05
Filed
H7073Creates Florida Accountability Office; provides duties & responsibilities of Florida Accountability Officer; provides investigative duties to Chief Inspector General & agency inspectors general; provides liability; requires certain records be sent to...2018-02-20
H7071Requires collection of specific data; requires FDLE to compile, maintain, & make publicly accessible data; provides requirements to make data comparable, transferable, & readily usable; requires digitized scoresheets to be prepared for all criminal d...2018-02-15
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18
S1916Prohibiting the disclosure of the personal identifying information of an alleged victim of sexual harassment or sexual misconduct, or information that could assist an individual in determining the identity of such alleged victim, in any portion of a ...2018-02-07
H8041Designates September 2018 as "Violence Prevention and Awareness Month" in Florida.2018-02-14
Adopted by Publication
H8039Recognizes August 15, 2018, as "India Independence Day" & August 2018 as "India Heritage Month" in Florida.2018-02-14
Adopted by Publication
H8043Designates May 2018 as "Haitian Heritage Month" in the State of Florida.2018-02-02
Introduced
H8037Recognizes June 2018 as "Caribbean Heritage Month" in Florida.2018-02-08
Adopted by Publication
H5001Provides moneys for annual period beginning July 1, 2018, & ending June 30, 2019, & supplemental appropriations for period ending June 30, 2018, to pay salaries & other expenses, capital outlay-buildings & other improvements, & for other specified pu...2018-02-08
In returning messages
H5005Provides for resolution of collective bargaining issues at impasse between State of Florida & certified bargaining units for state employees pursuant to specified instructions.2018-02-08
In returning messages
H5007Revises required employer retirement contribution rates for members of certain membership classes & subclasses of FRS; provides finding of important state interest.2018-02-08
Ordered enrolled
H5003Implements specific appropriations of General Appropriations Act for 2018-2019 fiscal year.2018-02-08
In returning messages
S1914Recognizing February 8, 2018, as "FAMU Day" in Florida, etc.2018-02-07
Adopted
H7069Re-creates Florida ABLE Program Trust Fund within SBA without modification; abrogates provisions relating to termination of trust fund, to conform; provides contingent effective date.2018-02-20
Placed on 3rd reading
H8035Designates February 6, 2018, as "FSU Day" in Florida.2018-02-07
Adopted by Publication
H8033Recognizes February 8, 2018, as "FAMU Day" in Florida.2018-02-08
Adopted by Publication
H7067Authorizes & directs Governor, in cooperation with Seminole Tribe of Florida, to execute new compact in certain form; requires Division of Pari-Mutuel Wagering to revoke permit to conduct pari-mutuel wagering for permitholder that fails to make speci...2018-02-06
H7065Requires DCF to adopt rules & procedures for exempting household members with disabilities from being fingerprinted before child is placed in home; authorizes court to make certain determinations regarding placement of child with guardian; authorizes...2018-02-19
Placed on Calendar
S1912Recognizing June 2018 as "Caribbean Heritage Month" in Florida, etc.2018-02-01
Adopted
S1910Recognizing February 3-10, 2018, as "Mental Health Awareness Week" in Florida, etc.2018-01-31
Adopted
H7061Increases jurisdictional limits for actions at law by county courts for specified period of time; provides formula to be used by Supreme Court in adjusting jurisdictional limit.2018-02-19
H7063Revises, creates, & repeals various provisions relating to acquisition, management, & disposition of conservation lands; beach management; water supply facilities, public water systems, & domestic wastewater systems; water resource development & capi...2018-02-20
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/22/18, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
S2506Increasing the number of years that a cancer center may participate in Tier 3 of the Florida Consortium of National Cancer Institute Centers Program; increasing the number of years after qualification that a certain Tier 3 cancer center may pursue sp...2018-02-02
Filed
S2508Redefining the terms "persistently low-performing school" and "school of hope"; defining the term "franchise model school"; authorizing specified schools to use a franchise model school as a turnaround option; defining the term "structured program"; ...2018-02-02
Filed
S2504Providing for the resolution of collective bargaining issues at impasse between the state and certified bargaining units of state employees, etc.2018-02-08
Laid on Table, refer to HB 5005
H8029Designates February 3-10, 2018, as "Mental Health Awareness Week" in Florida.2018-02-07
Adopted by Publication
feedback