DE SJR7 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act vacates the parkland dedication for approximately .204 acres of Tax Parcel No. 10-023.00-001 (Parkland Property). The removal of the parkland dedication allows for New Castle County to transfer that portion of the Parkland Property under ยง 1521(e) of Title 9 and as set forth in the Settlement Agreement between the Department of Transportation (DelDOT) and a private property owner, Dash In, to resolve a condemnation action filed by DelDOT. Due to the Propertys unique location, there are no known current or future public needs or benefits in continuing to restrict the use of the .204 acre portion of the Parkland Property as parkland and under the Settlement Agreement, New Castle County will receive approximately .204 acres of land in close proximity to the Parkland Property.
Title
Vacating The Parkland Dedication Of Approximately .204 Acres Of New Castle County Tax Parcel No. 10-023.00-001.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2022-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |