DE SJR7 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Senate Joint Resolution authorizes and encourages the Delaware Department of Transportation to conduct a Work a Day Earn a Pay Pilot Public Works Jobs Program.
Title
Establishing A Work A Day Earn A Pay Pilot Program Within The Department Of Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-07-01 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-28 | Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House | |
2018-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-27 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2018-06-26 | Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate |