DE SJR7 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This joint resolution designates March 2016 as "Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month" in the State of Delaware.Author: Senator Hall-Long
Title
Recognizing The Month Of March 2016 As "colorectal Cancer Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 35 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 6 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2016-03-17 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |