DE SJR4 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Senate Joint Resolution supports designating the “Honor and Remember Flag” as a national symbol for remembering our fallen U. S. servicemen and women. It further urges Delaware’s Congressional delegation to support action on the federal level to advance this cause.
Title
Designating The Honor And Remember Flag As The State's Emblem Of The Service And Sacrifice By The Brave Men And Women Of The United States Armed Forces Who Have Given Their Lives In The Line Of Duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2010-06-24 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (VETERANS AFFAIRS) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-17 | Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in Senate |