DE SJR3 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Senate Joint Resolution explains the concept of the “Healthcare Innovation Zone,” stresses its potential for increasing the effectiveness of healthcare services while reducing costs, and directs the Department of Health and Social Services, acting in conjunction with other state and private agencies and organizations, to take steps to prepare an application for the entire State of Delaware to be designated as a Healthcare Innovation Zone. The Resolution also urges the Governor of Delaware to proclaim the entire State of Delaware as a Healthcare Innovation Zone in order to demonstrate the interest of the healthcare provider community and state government in pursuing this opportunity.
Title
Calling For The Designation Of The Entire State Of Delaware As A Healthcare Innovation Zone.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2010-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-17 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2010-06-16 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-16 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-16 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2010-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-10 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |