DE SJR2 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The amount of testing required of our students and educators has grown significantly in recent years. While the General Assembly recognizes the need to administer assessments that provide valid and reliable data about how Delaware’s students are growing academically, it is also committed to maximizing time in the classroom for our educators to teach, and our students to learn. The Department of Education is already coordinating an inventory of all assessments required at the state, district, and school level. This Joint Resolution requires the Department of Education to report the inventory results, and any assessments that districts or the state propose to eliminate, to the public and to the House and Senate Education Committees of the General Assembly. It also requires the Department to convene a group, consisting of members of the General Assembly and the public, to conduct an in-depth review of the inventory results and make recommendations for consolidation or elimination of assessments.
Title
Directing The Department Of Education To Study Student Assessment Testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 4 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2015-06-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |