DE SJR17 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Senate Joint Resolution affirms the decision of the State Board of Education to approve the Wilmington Education Improvement Commission’s Plan (“the Plan”) and supports the continued work of the Commission in developing details of implementation of the Plan.It also recognizes that the Plan will require necessary and sufficient funding to achieve the goals laid out in the Plan for redistricting and improving student outcomes. In the absence of necessary and sufficient funding support for the Plan in the Fiscal Year 2017 budget, this Senate Joint Resolution does not fulfill the condition of 1026(d)(1) of Title 14 that the General Assembly pass and the Governor sign a joint resolution supporting the proposed changes to school district boundaries in New Castle County and does not constitute final approval of the transition and resources plan required under 1008(g) of Title 14. The General Assembly and the Governor anticipate that a joint resolution fulfilling those conditions be further considered after additional development of the details of implementation of the Plan.
Title
Affirming The Decision Of The State Board Of Education To Approve The Plan Of The Wilmington Education Improvement Commission And Authorizing Continued Work By The Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 21 YES 18 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-07-01 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 9 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |