DE SCR77 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Senate Concurrent Resolution designates the week of May 1, 2016 to May 7, 2016 as National Charter Schools Week and commends Delaware’s public charter schools for their efforts in educating Delaware students.
Title
Designating May 1, 2016 To May 7, 2016 As National Charter Schools Week.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | House | Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |