DE SCR55 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 17 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-17 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 17 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-17 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Concurrent Resolution directs the Delaware Department of Education to establish consistent regulations across the States early child care providers and programs. It also directs the Department to engage stakeholders in this process, and to make recommendations to the General Assembly by October 1, 2022, and propose necessary code revisions by January 1, 2023.
Title
Directing The Department Of Education To Establish Consistent Regulations For Child Care Licensing, The Early Childhood Assistance Program, And The Quality Rating And Improvement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-17 | Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2021-06-17 | Amendment HA 1 to SCR 55 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2021-06-16 | Amendment HA 1 to SCR 55 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-06-09 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-09 | Introduced in Senate |