DE SCR30 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This resolution recognizes April 26 - May 1, 2021 as "Auctioneers Week" in the State of Delaware.
Title
Recognizing April 26 - May 1, 2021 As "auctioneers Week" In The State Of Delaware.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2021-05-08 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-04-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-04-22 | Introduced in Senate |