DE SCR22 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This resolution establishes a Task Force on State Educational Technology. The Task Force will review how technology is used in public education classrooms. The Task Force must make certain determinations and issue recommendations. A Task Force report shall be completed by March 30, 2016.
Title
Establishing A Task Force To Study Educational Technology And Update The State Educational Technology Plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] |
Sen. Colin Bonini [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits |
2015-05-13 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |